GLOBAL VILLAGE EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GVE continues to raise funds in the UK for activities related to the growth and running of the Global Village School in Chakwal. Trustees continue to monitor progress and development of the children attending and the allocation of funding raised through mainly friends and family via the GVE bank account.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 April 2018: Standard registration
- GLOBAL VILLAGE EDUCATION (Working name)
- GLOBAL VILLAGE SCHOOL UK GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Rayhaan Moughal | Chair | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NUSRAT KHAN-CHEEMA | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHAHIDA KISHVER | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
YASMIN PLEWS | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AKRAM KHAN-CHEEMA OBE | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.18k | £14.55k | £6.46k | £5.51k | £6.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £15.56k | £0 | £523 | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APR 2018 as amended on 01 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PAKISTAN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. 2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN PAKISTAN IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Ashfield Avenue
SHIPLEY
West Yorkshire
BD18 3AL
- Phone:
- 07883761022
- Email:
- gvecharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window