UK DRI LTD

Charity number: 1179589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Sheena Elizabeth Radford Trustee 03 June 2020 None on record
MR ALASDAIR MOODIE Trustee 21 December 2017 None on record
Dr MELANIE GEORGINA LEE Trustee 20 December 2017
LIFEARC Received: On time
Robin Stuart Buckle Trustee 02 November 2017 None on record
Sir Doug Turnbull Trustee 03 June 2020 None on record
Jo Patra Pisani Trustee 12 September 2018 None on record
ANNE JANE SHEVAS Trustee 20 December 2017 None on record
Ian Wilson Trustee 03 June 2020
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING Recently registered
WILLIAM JOHN RUCKER Chair 10 November 2017 None on record
Fiona Mary Carragher Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record