HOPE CHURCH FERNDOWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian worship including teaching from the Bible, evangelism and prayer. Advancing the Christian faith through pastoral care and provision of facilities to members of society, including those with special needs. Encouraging, supporting and nurturing people in the church community to live out the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles Peter Woodcraft | Chair | 27 March 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID ALAN HALL | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart William John Smith | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Robinson | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.10k | £126.16k | £93.66k | £159.04k | £147.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.19k | £65.52k | £68.26k | £192.41k | £342.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN FERNDOWN AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE CHURCH
CORBIN AVENUE
FERNDOWN
BH22 8AZ
- Phone:
- 01202892351
- Email:
- gileswoodcraft@gmail.com
- Website:
-
hopechurchferndown.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window