CHOPWELL REGENERATION CIO

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
A volunteer community organisation. We are regenerating Chopwell by creating employment & skills-learning opportunities, improving the environment, improving housing, improving health & well-being, improving education & training, facilitating intergenerational communication, increasing visitors, stimulating growth & improving the look & feel of our village. All activity is driven by consultation.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 May 2024
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £5,700 o 3 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Pobl

10 Ymddiriedolwyr
203 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Llety/tai
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Gateshead
Llywodraethu
- 15 Mai 2019: CIO registration
- CHOPWELL REGENERATION GROUP (Enw gwaith)
- CHOPWELL REGENERATION C.I.C (Enw blaenorol)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
10 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barnie Andrews | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Donaldson | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Forster | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ferrie | Ymddiriedolwr | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Imlach | Ymddiriedolwr | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev TOM BRAZIER | Ymddiriedolwr | 21 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Quincey | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Jodie Barwick-Bell | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bell | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Coburn | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £43.02k | £93.29k | £340.20k | £234.08k | £279.72k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £14.96k | £73.19k | £95.83k | £164.70k | £276.82k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £5.00k | £5.90k | £9.87k | £5.70k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2024 | 16 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2024 | 16 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2023 | 03 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2023 | 03 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2022 | 08 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2022 | 10 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2021 | 28 Mawrth 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2021 | 28 Mawrth 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2020 | 11 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2020 | 11 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 May 2019 as amended on 03 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the CIO are: (1) the promotion for the benefit of the public of urban or rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation (and in particular in Chopwell and surrounding area), by all or any of the following means: (a) the relief of unemployment; (b) the advancement of education, training or retraining, particularly among unemployed people, and providing unemployed people with work experience; (c) the provision of financial assistance, technical assistance or business advice or consultancy in order to provide training and employment opportunities for unemployed people in cases of financial or other charitable need through help: (i) in setting up their own business, or (ii) to existing businesses; (d) the provision of housing for those who are in conditions of need and the improvement of housing in the public sector or in charitable ownership provided that such power shall not extend to relieving any local authorities or other bodies of a statutory duty to provide or improve housing; (e) the maintenance, improvement or provision of public amenities; (f) the preservation of buildings or sites of historic or architectural importance; (g) the provision of recreational facilities for the public at large or those who by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances, have need of such facilities; (h) such other means as may from time to determined subject to the prior written consent of the Charity Commissioners for England and Wales (2) to develop the capacity and skills of the members of the socially and economically socially disadvantaged community of Chopwell and the surrounding area in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society. 3) To further or benefit the residents of Chopwell and the neighbourhood, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents. 4) The prevention of financial hardship by providing or assisting in the provision of education, training, healthcare projects and all the necessary support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable income and be self-sufficient. 5) The relief of financial hardship among people living or working in Chopwell and surrounding areas by providing such persons with goods and services which they could not otherwise afford through lack of means. 6) To promote sustainable development for the benefit of the public by: (a) the preservation, conservation and the protection of the environment and the prudent use of resources; (b) the relief of poverty and the improvement of the conditions of life in socially and economically disadvantaged communities; (c) the promotion of sustainable means of achieving economic growth and regeneration. 7) To advance the education of the public in subjects relating to sustainable development and the protection, enhancement and rehabilitation of the environment and to promote study and research in such subjects provided that the useful results of such study are disseminated to the public at large. Sustainable development means “development which meets the needs of the present without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs.” 8) To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society. For the purpose of this clause ‘socially excluded’ means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one of more of the following factors: unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs; discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender re-assignment; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards; crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society).
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
The Bank
19-21 Derwent Street
Chopwell
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE17 7HU
- Ffôn:
- 01207261119
- E-bost:
- Team@chopwell.org
- Gwefan:
-
Www.chopwell.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window