SELLY PARK SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Selly Park Singers is choir of some 40 members, singing a range of classical, jazz and popular music. It is a non-audition choir. It has weekly rehearsals and performs concerts once or twice a year. We are based in south Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Joan Robinson | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rogers | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sarah Langham | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Mary Wilson | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Cullen | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Partridge | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Marris | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.26k | £4.52k | £5.96k | £7.94k | £10.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93k | £5.21k | £7.84k | £7.78k | £11.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 JAN 2018 as amended on 22 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 UPLAND ROAD
SELLY PARK
BIRMINGHAM
B29 7JS
- Phone:
- +447793525327
- Email:
- mail@sellyparksingers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window