MEDDYLGARWCH CYMRU / MINDFULNESS WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mindfulness Wales provides activities for practitioners to support a coordinated approach to promoting mindfulness in Wales including: - establishing a national network connecting those with an interest in mindfulness - promoting the involvement of organisations and individuals and - communicating with policy makers across sectors to educate and support them in understanding the benefits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Royston Stuart Ellis | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Margaret Tucker | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gwenan Mair Roberts | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Shaun Ruane | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lynne Fish | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Callen-Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250 | £3.33k | £1.92k | £9.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220 | £200 | £0 | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN WALES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF MINDFULNESS TRAINING WHICH ENABLE PARTICIPANTS TO DEVELOP THEIR UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF THE PRACTICE OF MINDFULNESS AND THE BENEFICIAL IMPACT IT MAY HAVE UPON GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-2 PARK COTTAGES
PENYGARN
PONTYPOOL
NP4 8BL
- Phone:
- 07946063068
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window