KINDNESS COUNTS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kindness Counts UK provide anti bullying resources for our school's and the local communities within the Fylde Coast in reducing bullying, anti social behavior, mental health issues & young suicides. The resources we provide are for the well-being of our younger generations making a confident, kinder, generation. Our community hub will help CAMHS by providing counselling/sensory room facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE ANN CARTER | Chair | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Major | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Major | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
keith carter | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
chynalouise courtney | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hernen | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Spragg | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Murphy | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Callum Baxter | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||
David Bannister | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.18k | £16.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.67k | £15.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF, OR AT RISK OF BEING VICTIMS OF BULLYING IN BLACKPOOL AND THE FYLDE COAST BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR RESOURCES AND FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY TO PROMOTE POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS AND DEVELOP THEIR WELLBEING AND RESILIENCE DURING FREE TIME IN SCHOOL. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY PROVIDING RESOURCES TO SUPPORT PERSONAL, SOCIAL AND HEALTH EDUCATION WITHIN SCHOOLS IN BLACKPOOL AND THE FYLDE COAST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Balmoral Place
THORNTON-CLEVELEYS
FY5 5HU
- Phone:
- 07506106853
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window