ATKINSON AND CLARKE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 517841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Foundation is designed to promote the education of young people who live in the villages of Newton le Willows and Patrick Brompton. The Trustees are responsible for giving financial assistance, where they consider it necessary, for educational purposes, in the form of grants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £10,657
Total expenditure: £7,397

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Graeme Peach Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Robin Pulham Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Nick Delaney BA BFP FCA Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Rev Robin David Christopher Lawton BATM TSSF Trustee 11 September 2017
CHURCH ABOUT THE DALE
Received: On time
NEWTON LE WILLOWS CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE UNITED CHARITIES OF HORNBY
Received: On time
Bridgette Anne Ormston Trustee 03 October 2016
None on record
MRS VAL NELSON Trustee
WENSLEYDALE TOURNAMENT OF SONG ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.22k £10.23k £10.86k £11.06k £10.66k
Total expenditure £7.97k £11.85k £11.14k £8.76k £7.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WARDELL HOUSE
PATRICK BROMPTON
BEDALE
DL8 1JU
Phone:
01677450255
Website:

No information available