THORNABY FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THORNABY FOODBANK SUPPORTS CLIENTS WITHIN THE TS17 POSTCODE WITH THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, NUTRITIONALLY BALANCED EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND SUPPORT TO THOSE INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE TS17 (THORNABY / INGLEBY BARWICK) AREA OF STOCKTON ON TEES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,400 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 12 May 2023: CIO registration
- THORNABY FOOD BANK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Collinson | Chair | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dennis Fox | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ellen Rees | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maria Patricia Rudd | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph McGinnis | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Shearer | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Macaulay | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, NUTRITIONALLY BALANCED EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND SUPPORT TO THOSE INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE TS17 (THORNABY / INGLEBY BARWICK) AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THORNABY FOODBANK
C/O THORNABY BAPTIST CHURCH
THORNTREE ROAD
THORNABY
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS17 8FZ
- Phone:
- 07469920606
- Email:
- thornabyfoodbank@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window