Financial history THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)

Charity number: 526054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.17k £1.16k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.14k £5.74k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A