Trustees THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)

Charity number: 526054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL LEE Chair 01 October 1990
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Neil Campbell MacInnes Trustee 26 June 2021
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
VANESSA GOLDSTONE Trustee 10 February 2021
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Tim Arthur Ernest Newns Trustee 10 February 2021
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Valerie Jane Torevell Trustee 10 February 2021
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathan Philip Langridge Trustee 10 February 2021
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
SEPTURA LIMITED
Received: On time
LONDON ENGLISH SONG FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Professor Linda Joyce Merrick Trustee 10 February 2021
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
HALLE CONCERTS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Professor HANNAH BARKER Trustee 01 October 2016
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Harry Ralph Ross Trustee 01 February 2015
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
MALCOLM EDGE Trustee 02 May 2013
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
The Very Revd Rogers Govender Trustee 30 March 2007
MANCHESTER MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND
Received: On time
MANCHESTER COUNCIL FOR COMMUNITY RELATIONS
Received: On time
ENGLISH CATHEDRALS FUND
Received: On time
THE MILLENNIUM QUARTER TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
RIPON COLLEGE CUDDESDON
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
CANON RICHSON'S EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
VOLITION COMMUNITY
Received: 45 days late
THE BENNETT STREET EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Overdue by 67 days
Dr DAVID HILL Trustee 30 March 2007
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE EARL OF DERBY Trustee 07 October 1996
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time