Financial history CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY

Charity number: 526702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £15.68m £12.02m £11.93m £10.68m £12.36m
Total expenditure £10.41m £10.55m £11.21m £11.71m £11.29m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £6.74m £6.82m £6.62m £7.21m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.29m £2.46m £2.00m £546.15k £1.68m
Income - Other trading activities £508.60k £268.72k £447.33k £562.82k £291.13k
Income - Charitable activities £8.72m £9.15m £9.34m £9.40m £9.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £152.76k £139.26k £140.99k £172.91k £182.27k
Income - Other £0 £7.79k £0 £0 £481.77k
Income - Legacies £137.60k £1.52m £1.68m £71.80k £1.23m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.86m £10.00m £10.46m £10.81m £10.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £552.00k £551.83k £756.64k £899.28k £259.03k
Expenditure - Governance £117.75k £97.82k £91.05k £96.46k £97.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.46k £7.77k £7.62k £7.55k £24.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £408.34k