Trustees CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY

Charity number: 526702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

28 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL LEE Chair 01 October 1990
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Linton Wesley Stephens Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Elaine Victoria Halstead Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Neil Campbell MacInnes Trustee 23 June 2021
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Leslie Richard Pratt Trustee 18 May 2021
BANBURY OPERATIC SOCIETY (BOS) AND YOUTH OF BANBURY OPERATIC SOCIETY (YOBOS)
Recently registered
Jonathan Philip Langridge Trustee 10 February 2021
LONDON ENGLISH SONG FESTIVAL
Received: On time
SEPTURA LIMITED
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Valerie Jane Torevell Trustee 10 February 2021
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Tim Arthur Ernest Newns Trustee 10 February 2021
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
VANESSA GOLDSTONE Trustee 10 February 2021
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Katharine Russell Trustee 06 May 2020
None on record
Sean Thomas McKendrick Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Dr Shengke Zhi Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Marcia Zelia Wall Trustee 25 September 2018
FODIP (THE FORUM FOR DISCUSSION OF ISRAEL AND PALESTINE)
Recently registered
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: 30 days late
Nigel Graham Shepherd Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record
Siobain Barnes Trustee 16 January 2018
None on record
Prof Linda Merrick Trustee 28 June 2017
CONSERVATOIRES UK
Received: On time
THE PITFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATED BOARD OF THE ROYAL SCHOOLS OF MUSIC
Received: On time
SUSAN MARKS Trustee 01 October 2016
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
W G S TRUST
Received: On time
Professor HANNAH BARKER Trustee 01 October 2016
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
Councillor Joan Davies Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Prof Bernadette Brennan Trustee 26 January 2016
BONE CANCER RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
KEVIN JAQUISS Trustee 01 October 2015
RELIGION MEDIA CENTRE
Received: On time
Harry Ralph Ross Trustee 01 February 2015
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
CAROLYN BAXENDALE Trustee 01 January 2015
BOLTON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
TRUST MUSIC
Received: On time
MALCOLM EDGE Trustee 26 May 2011
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Dr DAVID HILL Trustee
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
DAME ALEXANDRA BURSLEM DBE Trustee
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE RT. HON THE EARL OF DERBY DL Trustee
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
The Very Revd Rogers Govender Trustee
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CANON RICHSON'S EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
VOLITION COMMUNITY
Received: 45 days late
THE BENNETT STREET EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Overdue by 26 days
RIPON COLLEGE CUDDESDON
Received: On time
THE MILLENNIUM QUARTER TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ENGLISH CATHEDRALS FUND
Received: On time
MANCHESTER COUNCIL FOR COMMUNITY RELATIONS
Received: On time
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND
Received: On time
MANCHESTER MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered