CHURCH BURGESSES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational grants to young people under the age of 25 resident within Sheffield city boundary. Grants are available to both individuals and to youth organisations. Grants are made to cover Gap year trips, sporting and musical tuition and towards education, usually below tertiary level. Grants are also made to local Church schools and to Church-based youth work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 24 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR D STANLEY | Chair | 13 May 2008 |
|
|||||||||||
Prof Robert Edward Coleman | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
STEPHEN ECCLESTON | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Linda Margaret Kirk | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
DAVID FRANCIS BOOKER | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
REVD W H THOMAS | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev STEPHEN ALBERT PAUL HUNTER JP | Trustee | 06 May 1998 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.91k | £153.48k | £223.47k | £178.43k | £187.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.76k | £109.97k | £153.57k | £190.84k | £247.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ESTABLISHED BY ORDER DATED 16/02/1904 UNDER SECTION 2(2) OF BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT 1899; COMPRISED IN SCHEME DATED 10/12/1953 AS VARIED BY RESOLUTION DATED 5/08/1992 UNDER SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1985 AND SCHEME DATED 23/08/1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- A)IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; B)IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, BOOKS, EQUIPMENT, INSTRUMENTS OR TOOLS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS),TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; C)IN MAKING GRANTS TO ANY INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION THE OBJECTS OF WHICH INCLUDE THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF THE AFORESAID BENEFICIARIES
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WRIGLEYS SOLICITORS LLP
DERWENT HOUSE
150 ARUNDEL GATE
SHEFFIELD
S1 2FN
- Phone:
- 01142675596
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window