THE HERBERT HUGHES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It provides funds to support and encourage students studying Hispanic languages at educational establishments in the Sheffield area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 15 May 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA CLARKE BROWN | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Vincenzo Wadsworth | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MCKERVEY | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVID BEDFORD REID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN ENGLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £4.17k | £12.56k | £4.56k | £5.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.70k | £5.50k | £2.42k | £15.81k | £17.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 20 APR 1918 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO PROVIDE PRIZES BURARIES AND SCHOLARSHIPS FOR PROFICIENCY IN WRITING AND OF SPEAKING SPANISH PORTUGUESE AND (OR) ANY OTHER MODERN LANGUAGE SUCH PRIZES TO BE CALLED “HERBERT HUGHES PRIZES AND SCHOLARSHIPS”. TO PROVIDE TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENABLING STUDENTS TO TRAVEL IN FOREIGN COUNTRIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THEIR KNOWLEDGES OF THE LANGUAGE USED IN SUCH COUNTRY EVERY SUCH TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP TO BE CALLED THE HERBERT HUGHES TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP. TO PROMOTE IN ANY OTHER WAY (AND COUPLED WITH THE NAME OF "HERBERT HUGHES") THE EDUCATIONAL AND COMMERCIAL PROGRESS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD UNIVERSITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wake Smith Solicitors Ltd
2 Tenter Street
SHEFFIELD
S1 4BY
- Phone:
- 0114 2666660
- Email:
- john.baddeley@wake-smith.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window