SOCIETY FOR EARLY MODERN FRENCH STUDIES

Charity number: 802479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public by the promotion and encouragement of the study of the culture and history of France in the seventeenth century by means of the holding of meetings, by publications and by other means as may be deemed proper.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £20,282
Total expenditure: £18,731

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOCIETY FOR SEVENTEENTH-CENTURY FRENCH STUDIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Emily Butterworth Chair 25 June 2024
None on record
Dr Emma Claussen Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Professor Michael Moriarty Trustee 11 January 2024
None on record
katherine Stratton Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
Dr Veronique Desnain Trustee 05 July 2022
EDUCAID SIERRA LEONE
Received: On time
Dr David McCallam Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
Dr Jerome Brillaud Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
Dr Helena Taylor Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
Dr Emma Herdman Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
Dr Rowan Tomlinson Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Dr Adam Horsley Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR NOEL A PEACOCK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £17.08k £14.70k £10.03k £15.62k £20.28k
Total expenditure £13.38k £11.21k £2.85k £14.92k £18.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
University Of Exeter
Department of LCVS
Queens Building
The Queens Drive
EXETER
EX4 4QH
Phone:
01628778060