LIFEARC

Charity number: 1015243
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 August 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)