THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1036733
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 04 August 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)