NUFFIELD HEALTH

Charity number: 205533
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 09 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 July 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 28 July 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 29 June 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)