THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY

Charity number: 205846
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2016 04 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 04 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2015 02 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 02 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)