THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 22 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)