SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076822
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 November 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 November 2019 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 26 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 26 October 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)