CANCER RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1089464
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 24 August 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)