LLOYD'S REGISTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145988
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 19 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 28 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 28 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)