LIFEARC

Charity number: 1015243
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £1,750,000 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £29,708,000 £128,967,000 £24,100,000 £55,179,000 £992,204,000
Total expenditure £23,003,800 £24,828,000 £26,549,000 £30,621,000 £27,822,000