THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1036733
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £449,473,000 £731,514,000 £494,161,000 N/A £486,914,000
Other income £275,371,000 £1,300,000 £230,054,000 £727,478,000 £226,434,000
Total expenditure £854,233,000 £601,174,000 £695,468,000 £973,686,000 £635,374,000