THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY

Charity number: 205846
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
28/02/2015 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £21,840,858 £19,139,000 £17,130,185 £17,568,000 £16,701,000
Other income £472,267,142 £503,026,000 £574,611,815 £577,307,000 £617,638,000
Total expenditure £499,902,000 £540,563,000 £567,406,000 £605,459,000 £653,099,000