THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £82,075,345 £75,339,000 £87,535,289 £55,316,453 £40,851,275
Income from government grants £156,003,001 £162,748,000 £159,377,200 £169,282,320 £223,838,000
Other income £734,798,654 £741,551,979 £829,980,990 £947,741,502 £984,843,223
Total expenditure £975,863,000 £986,938,242 £1,085,934,194 £1,166,847,901 £1,219,658,273