THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 268369
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £188,000 £1,922,000
Other income £466,932,000 £503,327,000 £604,747,000 £597,547,000 £612,381,000
Total expenditure £448,184,000 £431,551,000 £516,267,000 £482,505,000 £626,326,000