SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076822
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £71,315,449 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £656,844,834 £714,263,501 £905,509,004 £945,262,441 £970,125,000
Total expenditure £657,225,355 £758,803,630 £926,071,588 £949,659,764 £973,970,400