CARDIFF UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1136855
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £60.39m £46.42m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £113.31m £131.69m
Other income £482.59m £511.75m £505.12m £343.98m £360.40m
Total expenditure £458.66m £485.62m £516.74m £540.49m £644.83m