LLOYD'S REGISTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145988
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1,062,537,000 £901,037,000 £908,172,000 £890,466,000 £916,278,000
Total expenditure £1,038,560,000 £893,940,000 £915,345,000 £898,967,000 £902,436,000