THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1036733
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 30/03/1994 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/1996 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 31/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2011

Charitable objects

(1) TO DEVELOP AND IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS. (2) TO INCREASE ACCESSIBILITY OF THE ARTS TO THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND; AND (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO FURTHER ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH RELATES TO THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF MUSEUMS AND LIBRARIES (WHICH ARE EITHER PUBLIC OR FROM WHICH THE PUBLIC MAY BENEFIT) AND TO THE PROTECTION OF CULTURAL PROPERTY; AND (4) TO ADVISE AND CO-OPERATE, WHERE IT IS APPROPRIATE TO DO SO, WITH DEPARTMENTS OF OUR GOVERNMENT, OUR SCOTTISH AMINISTRATION, THE NORTHERN IRELAND EXECUTIVE AND THE WELSH MINISTERS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, THE ARTS COUNCILS AND EQUIVALENT ORGANISATIONS IN THE MUSEUMS AND LIBRARIES SECTOR IN SCOTLAND, WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND (OR THEIR SUCCESSORS) AND OTHER BODIES ON ANY MATTERS RELATED TO THE OBJECTS IN (1), (2) AND (3) ABOVE.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED