THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY

Charity number: 205846
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

ACT OF PARLIAMENT THE NATIONAL TRUST ACTS, 1907, 1919, 1937, 1953 AND 1971 STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 1975 NO 1155. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED 12/01/2005 (AS EFFECTED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 2005 NO. 712) AMENDED 2/07/2008, 21/01/2009, 19/05/2010, 22/03/2016 AND 17/06/2020

Charitable objects

THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION OF LANDS AND TENEMENTS (INCLUDING BUILDINGS) OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND, AS REGARDS LANDS, FOR THE PRESERVATION (AS FAR AS PRACTICABLE) OF THEIR NATURAL ASPECT, FEATURES AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE. ALSO THE PRESERVATION OF FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION HAVING NATIONAL AND HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE NATIONAL TRUST ACTS, 1907 TO 1971).

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NATIONAL