THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 07/10/1940 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 26/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 22/07/1976 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 05/10/1983 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 27/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 04/12/1984 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 16/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 08/06/2011

Charitable objects

THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE BRITISH COUNCIL IS ESTABLISHED AND INCORPORATED ARE TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND WHICH SHALL: (A) PROMOTE CULTURAL RELATIONSHIPS AND THE UNDERSTANDING OF DIFFERENT CULTURES BETWEEN PEOPLE AND PEOPLES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES; (B) PROMOTE A WIDER KNOWLEDGE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM; (C) DEVELOP A WIDER KNOWLEDGE OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE; (D) ENCOURAGE CULTURAL, SCIENTIFIC, TECHNOLOGICAL AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL COOPERATION BETWEEN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES; OR (E) OTHERWISE PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED