THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 268369
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

TRUST DEED DATED 02/10/1974 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/11/1981 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/08/1982 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/11/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/02/2016

Charitable objects

TO BENEFIT ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION, TO USE ITS FUNDS FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHERESOEVER IN THE WORLD.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS