CANCER RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1089464
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2020

Charitable objects

THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ALL FORMS OF CANCER, INCLUDING THE DEVELOPMENT OF FINDINGS OF RESEARCH INTO PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS FOR THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCER AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT PRIMARY OBJECT, TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND RAISE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH MATTERS.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED