NUFFIELD HEALTH

Charity number: 205533
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN MASLIN Trustee 28 July 2017
CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS' LIVERY CHARITY On time
THE GURKHA MUSEUM TRUST On time
Dame Linda Margaret Homer Trustee 01 February 2019
The For Baby's Sake Trust On time
MARTIN WARWICK BRYANT Trustee 13 September 2013 None on record
Lord Victor Olufemi Adebowale Trustee 26 June 2019 None on record
Nilesh Sachdev Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
Patrick Figgis Trustee 27 June 2018
THE SHAKESPEARE GLOBE TRUST
BOWEL CANCER UK On time
RUSSELL STEPHEN MONS HARDY Trustee None on record
DR Natalie-Jane Anne Macdonald Trustee 01 February 2017 None on record
David William Lister Trustee 15 January 2014 None on record