THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir David John Verey CBE Trustee 02 December 2014 None on record
Fiona Salzen Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
CLARE REDDINGTON Trustee 01 May 2019
WISE CHILDREN LIMITED On time
Robert Owen Humphreys Trustee 11 June 2019 None on record
Sushil Kumar Saluja Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Yasmin Diamond CB Trustee 11 July 2017
SUSTAINABLE HOSPITALITY ALLIANCE On time
MARK BEDDY Trustee 07 October 2018 None on record
James Cronin Trustee 22 September 2015 None on record
Rageh Omaar Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Dr Stephen John Deuchar CBE Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Thomas Drew CMG Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Deborah Catherine Forster Trustee 28 October 2019 None on record
Stephanie Spring Chair 14 August 2019
MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) On time
Professor Malcolm Colin Press Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
JANIS RACHEL LOMAX Trustee 03 December 2018
THE DITCHLEY FOUNDATION On time