THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 268369
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Right Honourable Sir Ernest Ryder Trustee 12 February 2020 None on record
MATTHEW SEAN HAMMERSTEIN Trustee 25 September 2012 None on record
ROGER PERKIN Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Anne Heal Trustee 16 September 2019
THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS Charity reporting is up to date
BALLETBOYZ LTD Charity reporting is up to date
VOLUNTEERING MATTERS Charity reporting is up to date
David Peter Shalders Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
Susannah Storey Trustee 09 February 2017 None on record
JANET POPE Trustee 09 February 2016
CAMDEN SCHOOL FOUNDATION OF FRANCES MARY BUSS Charity reporting is up to date
Sir James Henry Leigh-Pemberton Trustee 01 April 2018
THE ALNWICK GARDEN TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE DUKE OF CORNWALL'S BENEVOLENT FUND Charity reporting is up to date
TIINA LE-SEONG LEE Trustee 04 March 2013 None on record
Cyrus Ardalan Trustee 01 December 2018
INTERNATIONAL FINANCE FACILITY FOR IMMUNISATION COMPANY Charity reporting is up to date