SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076822
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bradley Chapman Irwin Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Raymond Mankowitz Trustee 10 July 2019 None on record
Claudio Tesauro Trustee 11 March 2019 None on record
Anne Fahy Trustee 14 October 2016
BERKHAMSTED SCHOOLS GROUP On time
Margaret Ann McGetrick Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Tamara Ingram Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Peter John Hodgson Trustee 25 September 2015 None on record
Robert Patrick Henry Good Chair 01 January 2019 None on record
Debra Fine Trustee 11 May 2018 None on record
Joon Oh Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Lule Trustee 29 February 2016 None on record
Dona Young Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Charles Steel Trustee 30 July 2019 None on record
Roy Leonard Caple Hernandez Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record