CANCER RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1089464
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNE MARY SHAW Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
DAVID CLIVE LINDSELL Trustee 01 April 2014
CAMDEN MUSIC TRUST On time
IMPERIAL CANCER RESEARCH FUND On time
PROFESSOR DAME AMANDA GAY FISHER Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
TRACY ANNE DE GROOSE LLB Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR SIR LESZEK KRZYSZTOF BORYSIEWICZ Chair 13 July 2016
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LONDON FOR IMPROVING NATURAL KNOWLEDGE (COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE ROYAL SOCIETY) On time
Andrew William Palmer FCA Trustee 15 January 2014
THE ROYAL SCHOOL OF NEEDLEWORK On time
Peter Alan Chambre Trustee 13 July 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS CLWYD JONES Trustee 02 January 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR MOIRA KATHERINE BRIGID WHYTE Trustee 02 January 2020
MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION On time
CAROLYN JANE BRADLEY Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR SIR MICHAEL ADRIAN RICHARDS CBE Trustee 01 November 2017
HELPFORCE COMMUNITY TRUST On time
CATHERINE BROWN Trustee 23 September 2015
THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS On time
PROFESSOR STEPHEN TOWNLEY HOLGATE CBE Trustee 11 June 2014
ASTHMA ALLERGY AND INFLAMMATION RESEARCH TRUST LIMITED On time
SPARKS CHARITY On time
GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S CHARITY On time
PROFESSOR SIR BRUCE ANTHONY JOHN PONDER Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record