LLOYD'S REGISTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145988
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ishbel Jean Stewart Macpherson Trustee 25 June 2019 None on record
Andreas Sohmen-Pao Trustee 26 June 2018 None on record
Rosemary Martin Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record
CAROL FRANCES SERGEANT Trustee 15 January 2014 None on record
THOMAS THUNE ANDERSEN Chair 02 August 2012 None on record
LAMBROS VARNAVIDES Trustee 02 August 2012 None on record