Dogfen lywodraethu TAUNTON AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 13 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/12/2015 as amended on 07 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN TAUNTON DEANE DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF TAUNTON DEANE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.