Dogfen lywodraethu Three Choirs Festival Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH MARCH 1957 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAR 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1 The Objects of the TCF are to promote, maintain, improve and advance education by the encouragement of the arts, including the arts of singing and music, drama, mime and dance, and to formulate, prepare and establish schemes therefor provided that all Objects of the TCF shall be of a charitable nature.
Maes buddion
GLOUCESTER WORCESTER HEREFORD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.