Dogfen lywodraethu THE ABBEY SUTTON COURTENAY LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/09/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO STUDY AND PROMOTE THE APPLICATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO EXPLORE THE EXPERIENCE OF OTHER FAITHS IN THE LIGHT OF THE JUDAO-CHRISTIAN TRADITIONS AND OF MODERN PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SOCIAL SCIENCE TO THE NEEDS OF SOCIETY AND TO THE GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS SO THAT THEY MAY LEARN TO LIVE MORE FULLY AS PERSONS IN THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.