Dogfen lywodraethu QUAKER SOCIAL ACTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/03/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 SEP 2020 as amended on 18 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THROUGH INNOVATIVE SCHEMES DESIGNED TO PROMOTE SOCIAL JUSTICE AND THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND THE PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OR INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS, TO WITNESS QUAKER TESTIMONIES, TO THE EQUALITY OF ALL HUMANKIND, TO TRUTH, PERSONAL INTEGRITY AND PEACE, AND TO PROMOTE CO-OPERATION AND HARMONY BETWEEN ALL PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.