Dogfen lywodraethu THE LEPROSY MISSION INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2005 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN THE NAME OF JESUS CHRIST, TO MINISTER TO AND WORK FOR THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: 1. FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO LEPROSY, 2. FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY LEPROSY AND PEOPLE CONNECTED WITH THEM; TO ENABLE THEIR INTEGRATION IN THEIR COMMUNITIES 3. TOWARDS THE ERADICATION OF LEPROSY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.