Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE ELMBRIDGE (WEST)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13TH FEBRUARY 2002; AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8TH OCTOBER 2003 AND 1 NOVEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN ELMBRIDGE EPSOM, EWELL, SPELTHORNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
ELMBRIDGE EPSOM, EWELL, SPELTHORNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.