Dogfen lywodraethu PRESTON COMMUNITY NETWORK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUL 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF PRESTON IN SUCH WAYS THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE TO LEARN THROUGH EXPERIENCE THEREBY GAINING COMPETENCIES REALISING EXISTING SKILLS AND DEVELOPING THEIR POTENTIAL; 2. INVOLVING PEOPLE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH ENABLE THEM TO COLLECTIVELY GAIN CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN ABILITIES INCLUDING THEIR ABILITY TO INFLUENCE DECISIONS WHICH AFFECT THEM; 3. BY ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THEIR COMMUNITY AND WIDER SOCIETY IN A FULLER WAY; 4. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY COHESION.
Maes buddion
THE CITY OF PRESTON.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.